Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2010 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15416 Week
» 68432 Month
» 187959 Year
» 3214812 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12121 |
18/10/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12121 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
26/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/07/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12121 |
|
|
04/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|