Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3760 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 21563 Week
» 74579 Month
» 194106 Year
» 3220959 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12117 |
20/09/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/09/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12117 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
28/02/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12117 |
|
|
10/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|