Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 722 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18525 Week
» 71541 Month
» 191068 Year
» 3217921 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12107 |
17/05/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/05/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/05/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12107 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12107 |
|
|
09/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|