Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1352 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7136 Week
» 28525 Month
» 148052 Year
» 3174905 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12061 |
21/11/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£15,812.00 |
To Service |
21/11/1949 to Saltley (21A) |
Withdrawn |
09/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12061 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12061 |
|
|