Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 973 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18776 Week
» 71792 Month
» 191319 Year
» 3218172 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12054 |
30/05/1949 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/05/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12054 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
04/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
25/07/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12054 |
|
|
04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by A R Adams: Newport, Gwent |
|
|