Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1807 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7591 Week
» 28980 Month
» 148507 Year
» 3175360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12052 |
12/04/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£15,412.00 |
To Service |
12/04/1949 to Crewe South (5B) |
Withdrawn |
13/06/1971 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/04/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/04/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12052 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
26/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
13/06/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12052 |
|
|