Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 430 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 3796 Week
» 430 Month
» 337276 Year
» 1558841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 43 m/e 04/1914
Great Western Railway (1st) 1113 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (2nd) 428 m/e 31/10/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Dunbar
Class Unclassified
Company History BMJR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 04/1914
Withdrawal Fri 11/08/1950
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1914
   Withdrawn on 11/08/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SED Swansea East Dock 4w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC DYD Duffryn Yard 4w/e 27/12/1947
WDN DYD Duffryn Yard m/e 31/08/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1914 To Service To service as BMR Number 43
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 1113    
31/10/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 428    
11/08/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 428    

prev