Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2688 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16094 Week
» 69110 Month
» 188637 Year
» 3215490 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Pre Grouping |
40 |
m/e |
03/1914 |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
698 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
425 |
m/e |
31/07/1947 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1914 |
PILL |
|
Newport Pill |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
CDF |
|
Cardiff Canton |
4w/e |
28/01/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/02/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
4w/e |
28/01/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1914 |
To Service |
To service as BMR Number 40 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 698 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport Pill (PILL) |
|
|
31/07/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 425 |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
20/02/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 425 |
|
|