Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 539 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 5051 Week
» 27557 Month
» 330747 Year
» 1552312 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 48 m/e 02/1921
Great Western Railway 1375 y/e 1923
Great Western Railway (2nd) 434 on 08/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Dunbar
Class 45
Company History BMJR/GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B02/1921
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Tue 22/09/1953
Service Life 32 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1921
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 30/04/1951
   Withdrawn on 22/09/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays m/e 30/04/1951
WDN   m/e 30/09/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as BMR Number 48
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 1375    
08/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 434    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
09/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 434    

prev