Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 477 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4989 Week
» 27495 Month
» 330685 Year
» 1552250 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 50 m/e 02/1921
Great Western Railway 1670 y/e 1923
Great Western Railway (2nd) 436 on 28/10/1949 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Dunbar
Class 45
Company History BMJR/GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B02/1921
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Mon 15/02/1954
Total Mileage 458,149
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 27/03/1954 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 33 yrs , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1921
   Withdrawn on 15/02/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 28/02/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as BMR Number 50
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 1670    
28/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 436    
02/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 436    

prev prev