Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 446 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4958 Week
» 27464 Month
» 330654 Year
» 1552219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 49 m/e 02/1921
Great Western Railway 1668 y/e 1923
Great Western Railway (2nd) 435 on 28/04/1950 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Dunbar
Class 45
Company History BMJR/GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B02/1921
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Fri 19/02/1954
Total Mileage 492,873
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 01/01/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 33 yrs , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1921
   Withdrawn on 19/02/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 28/02/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as BMR Number 49
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 1668    
28/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 435    
02/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 435    

prev