Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3996 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17402 Week
» 70418 Month
» 189945 Year
» 3216798 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7124 |
30/10/1945 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12037 |
31/10/1945 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£11,425.00 |
To Service |
30/10/1945 |
Withdrawn |
19/10/1968 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1970 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1945 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1945 |
To Service |
|
|
|
31/10/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12037 |
|
|
26/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12037 |
|
|
05/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|