Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2607 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16013 Week
» 69029 Month
» 188556 Year
» 3215409 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7115 |
11/03/1942 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12028 |
18/12/1948 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,822.00 |
To Service |
11/03/1942 |
Withdrawn |
24/06/1967 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
04/04/1968 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/03/1942 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/03/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7115 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12028 |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12028 |
|
|
04/04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|