Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2890 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16296 Week
» 69312 Month
» 188839 Year
» 3215692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7099 |
07/1940 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12022 |
21/01/1950 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,126.00 |
To Service |
07/1940 |
Withdrawn |
12/11/1966 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1967 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/1940 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1940 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7099 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12022 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12022 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|