Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2610 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16016 Week
» 69032 Month
» 188559 Year
» 3215412 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7093 |
13/04/1940 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12016 |
04/06/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,126.00 |
To Service |
13/04/1940 |
Withdrawn |
30/09/1967 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1968 |
Cut At |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
13/04/1940 |
8C |
|
Speke Junction |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/09/1967 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/04/1940 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/04/1940 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7093 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
19/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12016 |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12016 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|