Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17173 Week
» 70189 Month
» 189716 Year
» 3216569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7089 |
30/12/1939 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12012 |
12/02/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,126.00 |
To Service |
30/12/1939 |
Withdrawn |
30/12/1967 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs |
Cut Up |
07/1968 |
Cut At |
W Hatton Ltd (at Bolton MPD) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1939 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7089 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12012 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Toton (18A) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
02/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
16/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (2K) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12012 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by W Hatton Ltd: at Bolton MPD |
|
|