Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4243 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17649 Week
» 70665 Month
» 190192 Year
» 3217045 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7086 |
09/11/1939 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12009 |
13/11/1948 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,126.00 |
To Service |
09/11/1939 |
Withdrawn |
30/09/1967 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
Cut Up |
09/1968 |
Cut At |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/11/1939 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/11/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7086 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
10/02/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12009 |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (1H) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
14/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12009 |
|
|
09/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|