Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1537 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19340 Week
» 72356 Month
» 191883 Year
» 3218736 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7080 |
26/05/1939 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12003 |
07/01/1950 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/05/1939 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/05/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7080 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
19/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12003 |
|
|
30/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12003 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|