Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1429 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14835 Week
» 67851 Month
» 187378 Year
» 3214231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3633 |
y/e |
1900 |
British Railways |
43633 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/04/1956 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 26/05/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1900 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3633 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43633 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
28/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43633 |
|
|
26/05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|