|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/04/1950 | Derby Works | New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. | SLS/195005 |
02/08/1953 | Warrington | Given a robust locomotive, the rising gradient southwards from Warrington (Bank Quay) usually holds no particular difficulties for passenger trains. It was therefore somewhat of an event to see southbound W.266, headed by 45726 Vindictive on Saturday, 2nd August, being banked by 0-6-0 43389 of 8B from Bank Quay up to the bridge over the Manchester Ship Canal. W.266 was made up to 15 bogies, and after 43389 dropped behind on the bridge, the latter ran forward to Acton Grange signal box, where she ran through the crossover and through on to the Down Chester-Warrington track to wend her way back into Arpley Yard and clear of the constant stream of Bank Holiday 'extras.' | SLS/195311 |
21/02/1959 | Woodford Halse MPD | On 21st February J11s 64331/418/28 were exchanged for MR 3Fs 43330/89/94 and these are employed on 'trip' work. | SLS/195904 |
21/03/1959 | Woodford Halse MPD | The Midland 3Fs (43330/89/94) are expected to go into store shortly-J10 65158 replaced 43394 for a short period but has gone back into store. 9Fs are now appearing regularly from Newport and Cardiff. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1892 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3389 Built at Sharp Stewart |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 43389 | ||
08/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
22/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
10/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
14/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
18/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
04/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43389 | ||
12/10/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |