Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 476 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18279 Week
» 71295 Month
» 190822 Year
» 3217675 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3300 |
m/e |
10/1891 |
British Railways |
43300 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 10/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 13/12/1958 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1891 |
19C |
|
Canklow |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
16A |
|
Nottingham |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
9D |
|
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/12/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
LOAN |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
17/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
15/05/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1891 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3300 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Canklow (19C) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43300 |
|
|
08/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43300 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|