Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14450 Week
» 67466 Month
» 186993 Year
» 3213846 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3294 |
y/e |
1891 |
British Railways |
43294 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/10/1950 |
Derby Works |
For shops W/E 28/10/50:-12058 18A, 40065 26A, 40433 7D, 41044 15D, 41049 17D, 41053 15C, 41166 8E, 41167 5A, 41193 27A, 42312 25B, 42402 11B, 43294 18D, 3748 15C, 3932 22B, 44176 21A, 47160 6C, 7235 19A, 47591 8B, 64787 30F. No. 40433 is for special examination, which may mean withdrawal. |
SLS/195012 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1891 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3294 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43294 |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43294 |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|