Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 30 Online
» 688 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4143 Week
» 15436 Month
» 280069 Year
» 1501634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1993 m/e 11/1912
BR 41993 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal Thu 19/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 46 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1912
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn on 19/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 19/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/10/1958 Plaistow Goods yard - stored locomotives 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81/2/4/5/6/7/90/1/2/3. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1993
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41993    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
19/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41993    

prev