Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 754 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4209 Week
» 15502 Month
» 280135 Year
» 1501700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1992 m/e 11/1912
BR 41992 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal Thu 19/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 46 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1912
13D Northwich on 01/01/1948
33A Plaistow 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn on 19/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33A Plaistow w/e 07/07/1951
WDN   w/e 25/07/1953
WDN   on 19/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/10/1958 Plaistow Goods yard - stored locomotives 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81/2/4/5/6/7/90/1/2/3. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1992
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (13D)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 41992    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
19/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41992    

prev prev