Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 724 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4179 Week
» 15472 Month
» 280105 Year
» 1501670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1989 m/e 09/1908
BR 41989 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 09/1908
Withdrawal Wed 09/04/1958
Scrapping During 04/1958
Service Life 49 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1908
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 09/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 09/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/03/1950 Bow Works Awaiting shopping were: Nos. 41933/89, 42516, 3256, 44034, 44243, 4288, 7221, 47302, 7307/14, 47511/15, 58038, 58280, 58303. Of these the most interesting was 0-4-4T No. 58038, previously 1261, originally M.R. 1257 (built 1876, Neilson & Co. No. 2063), one of the five surviving 5' 7' D.W. class. SLS/195005
02/04/1958 Derby Works (works yard) New construction on 2nd April was as follows : -D3503-6 almost complete, D3507-10 motors on, D3511-16 frames only. In the works yard for special examination were 40337, 41159, 41988/89, 43879. Fresh off works repainted after general repairs -40421, 40504, 43257, 43449 an 58123. SLS/195804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1908 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1989
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41989    
09/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 41989    

prev prev