Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 693 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4148 Week
» 15441 Month
» 280074 Year
» 1501639 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1987 m/e 08/1908
BR 41987 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 08/1908
Withdrawal Thu 19/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 50 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1908
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
24B Rose Grove 5w/e 16/07/1949
   Withdrawn on 19/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 19/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/10/1958 Plaistow Goods yard - stored locomotives 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81/2/4/5/6/7/90/1/2/3. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1908 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1987
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 41987    
19/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41987    

prev prev