Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 651 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4106 Week
» 15399 Month
» 280032 Year
» 1501597 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1985 m/e 07/1903
BR 41985 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 07/1903
Withdrawal Thu 19/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 55 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1903
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 21/07/1951
33B Tilbury 4w/e 17/05/1952
   Withdrawn on 19/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 17/05/1952
WDN   on 19/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/10/1958 Plaistow Goods yard - stored locomotives 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81/2/4/5/6/7/90/1/2/3. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1903 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1985
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41985    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
19/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41985    

prev prev