Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 650 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4105 Week
» 15398 Month
» 280031 Year
» 1501596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1984 m/e 07/1903
BR 41984 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 07/1903
Withdrawal Thu 19/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 55 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1903
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 19/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 19/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/06/1958 Devons Road MPD On 29th June, 11 steam and 34 diesels were on shed; in store was ex-L.T.S.R. 41984. SLS/195807
04/10/1958 Plaistow Goods yard - stored locomotives 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81/2/4/5/6/7/90/1/2/3. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1903 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1984
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41984    
19/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41984    

prev prev