Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 718 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4173 Week
» 15466 Month
» 280099 Year
» 1501664 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1980 m/e 06/1903
BR 41980 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal Fri 02/05/1958
Scrapping During 05/1958
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1903
13C Tilbury on 01/01/1948
33A Plaistow 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn on 02/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33A Plaistow w/e 07/07/1951
WDN   on 02/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/05/1958 Derby Works (Yard) 1st May. G-General repair, I-Intermediate Repair, L-Lined out. Paint Shop-118 (for cleaning up, fitting motion, etc.), D3509 (new), 12038 I, 44003 G, 44224 I, 44470 I, 48096 G, 47582 G, 73029 GL. Diesel Erecting Shop-E.D.2, D2508 (ex 11147), 10201 casual, 10202 attention to tyres, 12001/95, 13059. New Loco. Construction-D3510 (no. 8) (on test), D3511/2/3/4 (nos. 9, 10, 11, 12), D3515/7 (nos. 13/5) frames set up, D3522/3 (nos. 20/1).- Outside-East end, 11120, ED4 attention to crank pins; West end, 10100 cracked no. 1 AEC auxiliary engine cylinder block; test house, 10203. Erecting Shop no. 1 bay, 40580 G, 40681 G, 41900G, 42349 G, 42452 I, 42540 G, 43913 I, 44605 G, 48362 I, 48510 G, 48772 I, 80047 G, 80050 I; stripping section-42310 G, 48273 G, 48447 I; Erecting Shop no. 2 bay-42527 I, 43885 I, 44416 G, 44534 I; stripping-44561 G; frames only-D3516 (no. 14), D3518/9/20/1 (nos. 16/7/8/9) of Lot D658; Erecting Shop no. 3 bay-(new work, main line diesel) Lot B251, nos. 1-7, (Bo-Bo), (D5000-6). No Sulzer engine finally in position yet. No. 1 (D1 on welding jig), 1-Co-Co-1. Yard-40047, 40447 (submitted for cut-up from Crewe), 40680, 41066 (Exam.), 41086 (cut-up), 41980 (Exam.), 43332 (Exam.), 47004 G, 47218 I, 47290 G, 47488 I, 53800 (waiting cyls.), 73072, 75019. SLS/195805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1980
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tilbury (13C)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41980    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
02/05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 41980    

prev