05/07/1957 |
L.M.R. Class 8F 2-8-0\'s |
Longmoor Military Railway 8F's 500/1/12 entered Eastleigh Works in June for overhaul prior to being taken over by B.R. (W.R.) They were all ex Works by 5th July and renumbered 48773/4/5. L.M.R. 512 was involved in a collision with a diesel last October; L.M.R.501 was re-numbered 90734 for about 3 days till the error was spotted. It is understood another four are to be transferred to B.R. |
SLS/195708 |
04/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. |
SLS/196202 |
16/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. |
SLS/196202 |
04/02/1962 |
Derby MPD |
Ex-Works on 17A Shed: D3174, 12088, 12101, 42334, 43963/71, 44179, 44605, 47279, 47343/9/75, 47664/75/80, 48008, 48775. |
SLS/196203 |
14/11/1965 |
Crewe Works (Main Erecting shop) |
Main Erecting shop: 42249, 44690, 44761, 45021/150, 48176/214/53/78/92, 48544, 48775, 70010/25/6/9/53. 92012, D181, D208/15/21/89/97, D311/32/82/98, D1518/32/42/50/7/60/7/84/97, D1980-9. Electric shop: E3014/45/7/51/86, 26002/8, 27002. New Diesel Repair Shop: D153, D1534/70/82, D1683, D1717/76, D1843/60. Test Area: D1536/72, D1976, D5705/14. Traverser Area: 45421, 48545, 70013, 26027, E3060, D376/7, D1516/23/8/68, D1646/89, D1715, D1849, D5244, D5716. Side of Works: 48744, 70047, 92117/228, E3052. Paint shop: D1974/5/7/8/9, 46235, D305/58, E3054/97, D5709. Outside paint shop: 44809, 48033, 92063 re-painted, D347, D1541, D1634, D1770, D5710. |
SLS/196512 |