|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/08/1961 | Derby Works (In Works Sidings) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3160 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1993 |
||
03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3560 | ||
10/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8765 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (26C) | ||
31/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48765 | ||
14/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
17/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) | ||
13/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) | ||
13/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
08/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
25/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
06/11/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
02/09/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
11/05/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48765 | ||
12/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |