Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17886 Week
» 70902 Month
» 190429 Year
» 3217282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3153 |
m/e |
12/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3553 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8758 |
m/e |
09/1947 |
British Railways |
48758 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Works Number |
1559 |
To Service |
During 12/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/12/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/08/1952 |
Stranraer MPD |
The following locos. were on shed: 41099 (68C), 600/11/16 (68C), 45480 (68B) and 57445 (68C). Visitors included 48758 (68A), 44706 (67A) and 42919 (68B). 44101 was working the 10.0 p.m. Stranraer-College freight and 45642 Rodney the 9.15 p.m. 'Northern Irishman.' Shunting duties are performed by 0-4-4T 55125 and 0-6-OT 56372 an 56234. The latter shunts the Harbour Station. |
SLS/195211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3153 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1559 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3553 |
|
|
09/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8758 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48758 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
23/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48758 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|