|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
13/12/1964 | Doncaster MPD (Also on shed) | Stored: 60139/49, 61212, 90469/717, 92169/70/5; Also on shed: 48755(1F), D1519/39/45/56, D1766. | SLS/196501 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1945 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3150 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1556 |
||
03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3550 | ||
10/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8755 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
17/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) | ||
24/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48755 | ||
30/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
13/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
14/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford (5C) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) | ||
12/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (1F) | ||
09/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
19/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (2E) | ||
09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48755 | ||
06/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |