Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2511 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15917 Week
» 68933 Month
» 188460 Year
» 3215313 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3149 |
m/e |
10/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3549 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8754 |
m/e |
10/1947 |
British Railways |
48754 |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Works Number |
1555 |
To Service |
During 10/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/05/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3149 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1555 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3549 |
|
|
10/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8754 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48754 |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (1H) |
|
|
23/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48754 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|