Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2004 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15410 Week
» 68426 Month
» 187953 Year
» 3214806 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3132 |
m/e |
11/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3532 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8737 |
m/e |
10/1947 |
British Railways |
48737 |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1974 |
To Service |
During 11/1945 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sun 13/06/1965 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3132 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1974 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3532 |
|
|
10/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8737 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
01/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48737 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48737 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|