Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 903 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18706 Week
» 71722 Month
» 191249 Year
» 3218102 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3130 |
m/e |
11/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3530 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8735 |
m/e |
10/1947 |
British Railways |
48735 |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1972 |
To Service |
During 11/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3130 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1972 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3530 |
|
|
10/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8735 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48735 |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48735 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|