|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/03/1961 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7674 Built at Brighton Works |
||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3123 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3523 | ||
10/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8728 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
11/03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48728 | ||
22/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
23/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
24/09/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (16B) | ||
04/02/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (2E) | ||
11/03/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48728 | ||
08/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |