Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1985 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15391 Week
» 68407 Month
» 187934 Year
» 3214787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7668 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3117 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3517 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8722 |
m/e |
11/1947 |
British Railways |
48722 |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/05/1968 off Edge Hill (8A) |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7668 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3117 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3517 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8722 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) |
|
|
07/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48722 |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
21/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48722 from Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|