|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/06/1961 | Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7653 Built at Brighton Works |
||
04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3102 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3502 | ||
11/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8707 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
17/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48707 | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) | ||
31/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
05/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
26/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
20/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) | ||
06/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
15/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48707 | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |