Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8702 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
British Railways |
48702 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/05/1968 off Bolton (9K) |
Service Life |
24 yrs , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8702 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48702 |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
01/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48702 from Bolton (9K) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|