Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3381 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17424 Week
» 82378 Month
» 285042 Year
» 3311895 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8652 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
British Railways |
48652 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 11/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/06/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1968 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20B |
Stourton |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
20B |
Stourton |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
ALLOC |
9M |
Bury |
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
9K |
Bolton |
2w/e |
10/04/1965 |
ALLOC |
9K |
Bolton |
4w/e |
05/02/1966 |
WDN |
9K |
Bolton |
w/e |
29/06/1968 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8652 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48652 |
|
|
01/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
19/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (9M) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48652 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|