Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 2403 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15809 Week
» 68825 Month
» 188352 Year
» 3215205 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8633 |
m/e |
07/1943 |
British Railways |
48633 |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/03/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9A |
Longsight |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
6B |
Mold Junction |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/03/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8633 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48633 |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48633 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|