Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 476 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18279 Week
» 71295 Month
» 190822 Year
» 3217675 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8630 |
m/e |
06/1943 |
British Railways |
48630 |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 31/07/1965 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 2 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8630 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
11/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48630 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48630 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|