Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4202 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17608 Week
» 70624 Month
» 190151 Year
» 3217004 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8629 |
m/e |
06/1943 |
British Railways |
48629 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1943 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1966 |
Service Life |
23 yrs , 3 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8629 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48629 |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48629 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|