Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2625 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16031 Week
» 69047 Month
» 188574 Year
» 3215427 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8626 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
British Railways |
48626 |
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/01/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8626 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48626 |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
20/01/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48626 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|