Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2999 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16405 Week
» 69421 Month
» 188948 Year
» 3215801 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8625 |
m/e |
04/1943 |
British Railways |
48625 |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 04/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/06/1966 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8625 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48625 |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
28/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48625 |
|
|
08/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|