Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1298 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19101 Week
» 72117 Month
» 191644 Year
» 3218497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8606 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
British Railways |
48606 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1943 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1966 |
Service Life |
23 yrs |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
15B |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
02/05/1964 |
ALLOC |
16F |
Burton |
3w/e |
03/10/1964 |
ALLOC |
16G |
Westhouses |
5w/e |
11/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/10/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Probably the most interesting incident here during the past month was the arrival on 19/10 of ex C.R. 0-4-OST No. 16032, bearing a 31E shed plate. The engine arrived on a well-wagon, minus its wheels and motion. These were conveyed separately and subsequently assembled in the Erecting Shop. The engine has now joined the ranks of the Works' shunting locos. Since the completion of Class '5' 4-6-0 No. 4763 on 9/10, only one other engine has appeared; No. 4764 which was completed on 7/11. Of the remaining three engines of the present Order (E.467), Nos. 4765/66 were in an advanced state of completion on 7/11. These two engines are the first of six Class '5's' to be equipped with double chimneys and electric lighting. The current will be supplied by a turbo-generator mounted on a small bracket, approximately nine inches above the 'foot-framing,' on the right-hand side of the smokebox, behind the main steam pipe. Further '8F' 2-8-0's converted to oil-burning are: Nos.8064, 8269, 8370 an 8606, which were completed on 21/10, 20/10, 31/10 and 27/10 respectively. The following ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have been cut up since 11/10: 6627 (W/E 8/11), 6703 (W/E 1/11), 7755 (W/E 25/10), 7823 (W/E 18110), 27618 (W/E 25/10), 27640 (W/E 1/11), 28240 (W/E 18/10), 28369 (W/E 1/11), 28423 (W/E 8/11), 28482 (W/E 18/10), 28538 (W/E 8/11). Ex L.N.W.R. 'Prince of Wales' Class 4-6-0 No. 25845 has been withdrawn from service, and was observed in the Works' yard on 6/11 in a deplorable condition. |
SLS/194712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8606 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48606 |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
11/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48606 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|