|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/12/1959 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) | Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. | SLS/196001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8543 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1949 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Coalville (17C) | ||
20/08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48543 | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
02/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
06/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
22/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
20/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
12/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
12/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48543 | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |