|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/12/1961 | Horwich Works (Casual Repair Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8536 Built at Doncaster Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (2C) | ||
28/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48536 | ||
20/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
01/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Widnes (8D) | ||
11/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
18/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
26/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
10/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) | ||
02/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
06/08/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48536 | ||
06/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |