Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2065 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19868 Week
» 72884 Month
» 192411 Year
» 3219264 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8527 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
48527 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/10/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8527 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48527 |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
03/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48527 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|